Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Christopher Sudnik, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Taub, Sabrina Elena, against Aurora Contractors, Inc., E-J Electric Installation Company, New York Arena Partners, Llc, New York Belmont Partners, Llc, New York Belmont Retail Partners, Llc And, (total of 5) See All represented by Begley, Jamie R., Fichtelberg, Tod S., Paone, Nicholas L, Schneider, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Negligence) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 17, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 20, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 08, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 25, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 22, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 26, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 23, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 23, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 22, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 22, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 26, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 02, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Name Change |
||
January 10, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
November 20, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
November 17, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 15, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
November 08, 2023 | Answer To Aurora's Cross Claims | ||
September 27, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
September 22, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands (AURORA) |
||
September 22, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars (NY BELMONT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.