Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
James Capobianco, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barab, Jesse, against James Demarco, Jason Houlihan, The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Howard G. Lane presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management205 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1067 days |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 30, 2015RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 13, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 11, 2016NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: April 06, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: April 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 17, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled - Other TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
June 07, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
May 31, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
May 31, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
May 24, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
May 24, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
April 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
April 09, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
January 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
January 08, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.