Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Emilio Altruz, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Aberle, Richard M., against Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority, represented by Attorney Opted Out Of Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with DARRELL L. GAVRIN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time836 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 25, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 04, 2015ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 19, 2016PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 09, 2015SUMMONS
Date: July 06, 2015NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 29, 2016RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 06, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2017 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN(D) Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
June 05, 2017 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
October 18, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART SOS Judge: CENTRALIZED MOTION PART |
|
October 05, 2016 | Motion |
VACATE NOTE OF ISSUE (Motion #001) Decided: 10/18/2016MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Answer demanded: Yes Judge: CENTRALIZED MOTION PART |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
August 29, 2016 | Hearing |
NOTE FILED
Judge: DARRELL L. GAVRIN |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
May 02, 2016 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Judge: DARRELL L. GAVRIN |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.