Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Laura Molina, Luz Gregory, Vanessa Molina An Infant By Her M N G Luz Gregory, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Goldberg, Michael M, against Danny O'Brian, James T. Power, Manuel E. Molina, Rockmills Steel Products Corp., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugustus C Agate Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time266 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2014 | Hearing |
SETTLED PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PT 24 PRELIM CONF FINAL Judge: AUGUSTUS C. AGATE |
|
July 10, 2014 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 24 PRELIM CONF Judge: AUGUSTUS C. AGATE |
|
May 29, 2014 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NON PARTICIPATION FOR DEFENDANTS JAMES POWER,DANNY O'BRIAN AND ROCKMILLS STEEL PRODUCTS CORP.. MUST NON PARTICIPATION FOR DEFENDANTS JAMES POWER,DANNY O'BRIAN AND ROCKMILLS STEEL PRODUCTS CORP.. MUST ... show more |
||
March 21, 2014 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NON PARTICIPATION FOR DEFENDANT. MUST VIEW QCC MINUTES ALSO FOR FILINGS. |
||
November 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rockmills Steel Products Corp. via Secretary of State - Aff of Service |
||
November 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rockmills Steel Products - Aff of Service |
||
November 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Manuel E. Molina - Aff of Service |
||
November 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Danny O'Brian - Aff of Service |
||
November 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE James T. Power - Aff of Service |
||
November 14, 2013 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT s/c |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.