Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
One West Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors And Assigns, All Of Whom And Whose Names, Charles Barnwell As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Zephaniah Barnwell, Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors And Assigns, All Of Whom And Whose Names, Except As Stated, Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Divine L. Barnwell A K A Divine Robinson As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Zephaniah Barnwell, (total of 16) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Nicole Mcgregor-Mundy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNicole Mcgregor-Mundy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors And Assigns, All Of Whom And Whose Names
Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors And Assigns, All Of Whom And Whose Names, Except As Stated, Are Unknown To Plaintiff
Divine L. Barnwell A K A Divine Robinson As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Zephaniah Barnwell
Divine L. Barnwell A K A Divine Robinson As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Zephaniah Barnwell If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely: The Wife, Widow, Husband, Widower, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors
John Doe #1 To John Doe #25, Said Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint
Uknown Heirs And Distributees Of The Estate Of Zephaniah Barnwell Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely: The Wife, Widow, Husband, Widower, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees
SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: May 10, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 08, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: June 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 05, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 01, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2022DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT
Date: April 21, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order Discontinuing Action and Cancelling Notice of Pendency |
||
September 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 18, 2023 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
August 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER | ||
July 24, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #004) Declined to Sign |
||
June 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER | ||
June 14, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #004) TO SETTLE ORDER TO DISCONTINUE |
||
June 01, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Motion Seq#4 Submission Form |
||
May 08, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.