Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carmin Gowdie, Shamar Cohen, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Davy, Courtney Kirk-Patrick, against Melvin Barnaby, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Kevin J Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management451 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Wrongful Eviction) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time525 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 17, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 17, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 26, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: May 07, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: June 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 10, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
May 07, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
February 26, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
February 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 16, 2019 | Hearing |
INACTIVE PRE-NOTE TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
June 13, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) PT 43 MOTIONS Judge: LAURENCE L. LOVE |
|
June 03, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PT 43 PRELIM CONF M-DFLT Judge: LAURENCE L. LOVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.