Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Joseph L Roberson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ofshtein, Akiva, against Niesha S Gould, represented by Halpern, Naftali Tzvi, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with RICHARD LATIN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management202 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time777 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 13, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 28, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
May 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Discontinued TRIAL SCHEDULING PART D EFILED STIP (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
May 01, 2020 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART D EFILED STIP Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
April 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
April 28, 2020 | Hearing |
ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER |
|
February 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) PART 40 MOTIONS Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
February 20, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) PT 40 MOTIONS Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.