Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nyctl 2017-A Trust, The Bank Of New York Mellon As Collateral Agent And Custodian For The Nyctl 2017-A Trust, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Resnikoff, Michael H, Resnikoff, Michael Hunter, against 46-05 48 Avenue Corp., Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein, Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein, John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said, John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Martin J Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein
Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein
John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said
John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 28, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 26, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 26, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 19, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
|
July 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued PART 29 EFILE STIP OF DISC (Conversion) Judge: Schulman, Hon. Martin J. |
|
July 26, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE PT 29 GEN CAL EFILE STIP OF DISC Judge: MARTIN J. SCHULMAN |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) MEMORANDUM |
|
June 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) PART 29 MOTIONS Judge: Schulman, Hon. Martin J. |
|
June 20, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) PT 29 MOTIONS Judge: MARTIN J. SCHULMAN |
|
May 22, 2018 | Motion |
Appoint - Referee (Motion #001) Decided: 06/22/2018Granted Before Justice: Schulman, Hon. Martin J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Schulman, Hon. Martin J. |
|
May 22, 2018 | Motion |
APPOINT REFEREE (Motion #001) Decided: 06/22/2018SUBMIT ORDER/JUDG Before Justice: MARTIN J. SCHULMAN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: MARTIN J. SCHULMAN |
|
May 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Josef F. Abt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.