Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gavlik, Amy, Jordan, Tarah Eve, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Thais B Brown, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Elliot, Hon. David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time496 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: August 06, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 10, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 20, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DERB832008 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 02, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
August 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Held PART 14 VIRTUAL CONF. |
|
August 26, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation of consent to vacate judgment and settle action |
||
August 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 14 VIRTUAL CONF |
|
July 20, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) PART 14 MOTIONS Judge: Elliot, Hon. David |
|
June 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AFFIRMATION IN RESPONSE |
||
June 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
June 21, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D LETTER OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.