Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mitchell Carranza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rubenstein, Joel M, against Ana Maria Jirves, represented by Hunter-Ensor, Gabrielle Rose, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with DARRELL L. GAVRIN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: August 28, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 28, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 08, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 03, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 16, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 26, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 04, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #003) PART 27 MOTIONS Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
May 11, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) PART 27 MOTIONS Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
March 08, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) To Dismiss |
||
March 08, 2021 | Motion |
Discovery (Motion #003) Decided: 07/20/2021Withdrawn Before Justice: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Independent Medical Examination Appointment Letters |
||
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) So-Ordered Stipulation |
||
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Compliance Conference Order |
||
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Preliminary Conference Order |
||
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.