Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bhagrattie Chatoor, Denise Madramootoo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Khutoryansky, Aleksandr, Krupnik, Alla, against Hansraj Negesar, Randy Tulsieram, represented by Scahill, Francis J, Tamke, David John, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with MAUREEN A. HEALY presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management118 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time451 days |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 20, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 03, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 20, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 20, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 10, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 21, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 28, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 22, 2019ORDER - JOINT TRIAL
Date: October 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 21, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 07, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 03, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 14, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - JOINT TRIAL | |
June 21, 2019 | Hearing |
INACTIVE PRE-NOTE NOTE OF ISSUE DUE J/T Judge: MAUREEN A. HEALY |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action With Prejudice |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AOS |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 17, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.