Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nyctl 2017-A Trust And The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Collateral Agent And Custodian For Nyctl 2017-A Trust, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Levy, Joshua, against And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Or Through Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, If They Be Dead, Whether By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Including Any Right, Title Or Interest In And To The Real Property Described In The Complaint Herein, All Of Who And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To The Plaintiffs, Boodlal Surujballie, Hamilliah Narine, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #100, Krishenlal Narine, (total of 11) See All represented by Vernon, Donald Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Kevin J Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time461 days |
And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Or Through Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, If They Be Dead, Whether By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Including Any Right, Title Or Interest In And To The Real Property Described In The Complaint Herein, All Of Who And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To The Plaintiffs
The Last 100 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiffs, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Owners, Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, And If Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, Be Dead, Their Respective Heirs-At-Law, Next Of Kin, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Devisees, Legatees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, And Successors In Interest
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 27, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 16, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 08, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 16, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #001) PART 10 MOTIONS NAM (Conversion) Judge: Kerrigan, Hon. Kevin |
|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
MARKED OFF (Motion #001) PT 10 MOTIONS NAM Judge: KEVIN KERRIGAN |
|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued PART 10 DISC FILED 6/5/19 (Conversion) Judge: Kerrigan, Hon. Kevin |
|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE PT 10 GEN CAL DISC FILED 6/5/19 Judge: KEVIN KERRIGAN |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) letter withdrawing motion |
|
May 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) PART 10 MOTIONS 562019 (Conversion) Judge: Kerrigan, Hon. Kevin |
|
May 06, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PT 10 MOTIONS Judge: KEVIN KERRIGAN |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Copy of letter, re: return date of 5/6/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.