Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Raul Marquez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sandberg, Joshua B, against Augusto Naula, Idrovo Carrier Corporation, represented by Sloane, Marc D, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time420 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 21, 2019ORDER - JOINT TRIAL
Date: March 18, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - JOINT TRIAL WITH INDEX #5697/2017 |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer With Affirmative Defenses | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Def. Augusto Naula |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Def Idrovo Carrier Corp. |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Def Idrovo Carrier Corp (Sec of State) |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.