Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Yul Ok, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jeong, Yongil, Louros, Steven, against John W. Cotton, Logistical Aggregate Transport Inc, represented by Flamhaft, Jonathan Peter, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Ulysses B Leverett presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management121 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time428 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 16, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 16, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2018ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: January 11, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 12, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 16, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2018ANSWER
Date: May 03, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
February 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Stay Compliance Conference Part CERT FILED (Conversion) Judge: Leverett, Hon. Ulysses B. |
|
February 06, 2019 | Hearing |
STAYED-DEFENDANT DECEASED PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE CERT FILED Judge: ULYSSES B. LEVERETT |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
January 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #003) PART 41 MOTIONS Judge: Leverett, Hon. Ulysses B. |
|
January 09, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #003) PT 41 MOTIONS Judge: ULYSSES B. LEVERETT |
|
November 30, 2018 | Motion |
Stay (Motion #003) Decided: 01/09/2019Granted Before Justice: Leverett, Hon. Ulysses B. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Leverett, Hon. Ulysses B. |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Motion to Stay |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Motion Backer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.