Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tri-State Consumer Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pevzner, Bella, Studley, Mitchell Jay, against Gloria Usma, Government Employees Insurance Company, Jaquel Mckinney, Monowara Begum, represented by Feller, Sharon Toni, Koval, Mark Ira, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Ulysses B Leverett presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time427 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 20, 2018PETITION
Date: March 27, 2018ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: June 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 27, 2018ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: May 28, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
May 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Post-Note) PART 41 PET TO STAY ARB, IS GRANTED (Conversion) Judge: Leverett, Hon. Ulysses B. |
|
May 09, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP (POST-NOTE) PT 41 TRIAL CAL PET TO STAY ARB IS GRANTED Judge: ULYSSES B. LEVERETT |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
November 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 13 PER SFO 6/18/18 (Conversion) Judge: Raffaele, Hon. Thomas D. |
|
November 29, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 13 TRIAL CAL PER SFO 6/18/18 Judge: THOMAS D. RAFFAELE |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Electronic and Paper Mail Service for the Order with Notice of Entry |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.