Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nyctl 2017-A Trust And The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Collateral Agent And Custodian For Nyctl 2017-A Trust, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Levy, Joshua, against And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Or Through Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, If They Be Dead, Whether By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Including Any Right, Title Or Interest In And To The Real Property Described In The Complaint Herein, All Of Who And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To The Plaintiffs, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Or Through Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, If They Be Dead, Whether By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Including Any Right, Title Or Interest In And To The Real Property Described In The Complaint Herein, All Of Who And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To The Plaintiffs, Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp, Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp, City Of New York Department Of Housing Preservation And Development, (total of 14) See All represented by Ross, Karen M., in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time334 days |
And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Or Through Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, If They Be Dead, Whether By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Including Any Right, Title Or Interest In And To The Real Property Described In The Complaint Herein, All Of Who And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To The Plaintiffs
And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Or Through Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, If They Be Dead, Whether By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Including Any Right, Title Or Interest In And To The Real Property Described In The Complaint Herein, All Of Who And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To The Plaintiffs
Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp
Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp
The Last 100 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiffs, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Owners, Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, And If Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, Be Dead, Their Respective Heirs-At-Law, Next Of Kin, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Devisees, Legatees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, And Successors In Interest
The Last 100 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiffs, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Owners, Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, And If Any Of The Aforesaid Individual Captioned Defendants, If Any, Be Dead, Their Respective Heirs-At-Law, Next Of Kin, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Devisees, Legatees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, And Successors In Interest
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 27, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
February 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITYSCAPE CORP |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUZBY S. GALLEGO |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING PRESERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.