Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vincent Gelzer, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Jaffe, Richard S., against 56Th Realty, Llc, 56Th Realty,Llc, D B A Manhattan Art And Antiques Center, 56Th Realty, Llc Individually, Glenwood Management Corp., Manhattan Art And Antiques Center, (total of 6) See All represented by Kelly, John Fitzgerald, Lechleitner, Peter D, Schuster, Michele, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with ROBERT J. MCDONALD presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 28, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Post EBT Demand
Date: May 02, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 28, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 13, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 21, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 14, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 27, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 16, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 10, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 02, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 25, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 02, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 19, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 19, 2019STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: July 19, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 12, 2019STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 19, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: August 10, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | Hearing |
LANCMAN COMPLIANCE CERT ORDER TAKEN IN ON 9/9 Judge: Cohanim Lancman, Hon. Mojgan |
|
October 29, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE DUE
Judge: Compliance Conf Judge, |
|
September 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Held LANCMAN COMPLIANCE CERT ORDER Judge: Cohanim Lancman, Hon. Mojgan |
|
April 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Held LANCMAN COMPLIANCE VIRT CONF 11AM (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
March 02, 2021 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
March 02, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 25, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER SO ORDERED |
||
February 25, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT entire e-file case #721637/19 |
||
February 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Held LANCMAN COMPLIANCE Supreme Trial; CONF HELD NOI WAS, VACATED (Conversion) Judge: Cohanim Lancman, Hon. Mojgan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.