Macedonia African Methodist Episcopal Church, filed a(n) Other Matters - Sale Or Finance Of Religious/Not For Profit Property case represented by Martin, Paul Pricey, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Courtwith Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeRichard G. Latin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Sale Or Finance Of Religious/Not For Profit Property |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Matter TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: April 19, 2018RJI -RE: 202.6(b) (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: March 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - M
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
March 28, 2018 | Motion |
Miscellaneous Special Proceedings (Motion #001) Decided: 04/06/2018Closed Before Justice: Latin, Hon. Richard Answer demanded: No Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
March 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) EXPARTE Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
March 28, 2018 | Motion |
MISC. SPECIAL PROC (Motion #001) Decided: 04/06/2018CASEDISP-EXP ORDER GRANTED Before Justice: RICHARD LATIN Answer demanded: No Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
March 28, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) EXPARTE Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: 202.6(b) (Motion #001) *Corrected* Other Ex Parte Application |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) *Corrected* Proposed Order with Attorney General No Objection |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M New York Board of Trustees |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L Church Conference Resolution |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N Financials 2016/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.