Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vladislava Sevizdrova, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Levi, Daniella, against Henry Castro, The New York City Transit Authority, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Joseph J Risi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J Risi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time567 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 28, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 28, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 12, 2018PETITION
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER |
|
September 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) PART 03 S/P (Conversion) Judge: Risi, Hon. Joseph J. |
|
September 26, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) PT 3 GEN CAL S/P Judge: JOSEPH RISI |
|
May 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) PART 03 MOTIONS 05/15/18 (Conversion) Judge: Risi, Hon. Joseph J. |
|
May 29, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) PT 3 MOTIONS Judge: JOSEPH RISI |
|
May 28, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) PART 03 MOTIONS 05/15/18 (Conversion) Judge: Risi, Hon. Joseph J. |
|
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PT 3 MOTIONS Judge: JOSEPH RISI |
|
April 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part IAS, E/F C/C* 03/28/2018 (Conversion) Judge: Risi, Hon. Joseph J. |
|
April 18, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART IAS E/F C/C* 03/28/2018 Judge: JOSEPH RISI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.