Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gmac Mortgage, Llc,, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Floyd Barker, Genieve Barker, Premier Mortgage Corp. D B A Pmc Mortgage Co.,, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Darrell L Gavrin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDarrell L Gavrin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15 - Quiet Title) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time493 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 21, 2018ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: February 04, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: December 19, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 21, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 21, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Inactive STATUS CONFERENCE PT. C N/A/E/S (Conversion) Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
July 18, 2019 | Hearing |
INACTIVE PRE-NOTE STATUS CONFERENCE PT. C N/A/E/S Judge: DARRELL L. GAVRIN |
|
June 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Rescheduled STATUS CONFERENCE PT. C 10:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
June 20, 2019 | Hearing |
ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE PT. C 10:00 AM Judge: DARRELL L. GAVRIN |
|
April 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned NON-APPEARANCE CONTROL PART C S.O. (Conversion) Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
April 25, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED NON-APPEARANCE CONTROL PART C S.O. Judge: DARRELL L. GAVRIN |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | |
January 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned NON-APPEARANCE CONTROL PART C Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
|
January 25, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED NON-APPEARANCE CONTROL PART C Judge: DARRELL L. GAVRIN |
|
January 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Rescheduled NON-APPEARANCE CONTROL PART C S.O. (Conversion) Judge: Gavrin, Hon. Darrell L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.