Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Soonil Nam, Young S. Leenam, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Louros, Steven, against Sangwoo Lee, represented by Kaplan, Howard J, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Timothy J Dufficy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy J Dufficy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management85 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time218 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 22, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 18, 2018ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: October 15, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 26, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
September 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued PART 35 STIP DISC (Conversion) Judge: Dufficy, Hon. Timothy J. |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 05, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE PT 35 GEN CAL STIP DISC Judge: TIMOTHY J. DUFFICY |
|
August 14, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) PART 35 MOTIONS Judge: Dufficy, Hon. Timothy J. |
|
August 14, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) PT 35 MOTIONS Judge: TIMOTHY J. DUFFICY |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion |
|
June 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) PART 35 MOTIONS Judge: Dufficy, Hon. Timothy J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.