Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nyctl 2017-A Trust, The Bank Of New York Mellon As Collateral Agent And Custodian For The Nyctl 2017-A Trust, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Resnikoff, Michael H, Resnikoff, Michael Hunter, against 48-17 25Th Avenue Realty Llc, Flora Co., A Partnership, Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein, John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said, New York City Department Of Finance, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Cycle Time87 days |
Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein
John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: May 08, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 17, 2018STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 29, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 08, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 26, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) PT 36 MOTIONS Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
May 29, 2018 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 29, 2018 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
May 29, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE PT 36 GEN CAL STIP OF DISCONT. Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
May 17, 2018 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 10, 2018 | Motion |
APPOINT REFEREE (Motion #001) Decided: 06/07/2018MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
May 08, 2018 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 08, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit to Affirmation of Leonid Krechmer |
||
May 08, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Supplemental Affirmation |
||
May 08, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.