Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nyctl 1997-1 Trust, The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Collateral Agent And Custodian For The Nyctl 1997-1 Trust, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Resnikoff, Michael H, Resnikoff, Michael Hunter, against Astoria Federal Savings And Loan Association, Christina Judge As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Theodore M. Kenny, Herbert Judge Jr. As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Theodore M. Kenny, Herbert Judge Sr. As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Theodore M. Kenny, Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Joseph Esposito presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Esposito Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Cycle Time374 days |
Individual Defendants Be Dead, Their Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Committees, Devisees, Legatees, And The Assignees, Lienors, Creditors And Successors In Interest Of Them, And Generally All Persons Having Or Claiming Under, By, Through, Or Against The Said Defendants Named As A Class, Of Any Right, Title, Or Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint Herein
John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 100 Inclusive, The Names Of The Last 100 Defendants Being Fictitious, The True Names Of Said Defendants Being Unknown To Plaintiff, It Being Intended To Designate Fee Owners, Tenants Or Occupants Of The Liened Premises And Or Persons Or Parties Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or A Lien Upon The Liened Premises, If The Aforesaid Individual Defendants Are Living, And If Any Or All Of Said
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 06, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 26, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 29, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 08, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 08, 2018STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 08, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued PART 06 DISC FILED 11/08/18 (Conversion) Judge: Esposito, Hon. Joseph J. |
|
March 21, 2019 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE PT 6 GEN CAL DISC FILED 11/08/18 Judge: JOSEPH J. ESPOSITO |
|
November 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) PT 6 Motions Judge: Hart, Hon. Ernest F. |
|
November 19, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) PT 6 MOTIONS Judge: ERNEST F. HART |
|
November 08, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 08, 2018 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
||
November 08, 2018 |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency |
||
October 29, 2018 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence to the Judge |
||
October 02, 2018 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
September 06, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.