Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Headley A Weir, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Niyazov, Arsen Ariel, Ofshtein, Akiva, against Guy Jamal James, Stephany S Gordon, represented by Petrocelli, Richard Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time196 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 24, 2018ANSWER
Date: June 01, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer along with Various Demands |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certification |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.