Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thalia Agathocleous, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Baez, James Robert, Bernstein, Boris, Mchugh, Russell Thomas, Sacco, Tonino, Tucker, Clifford Ryan, (total of 5) See All against 795 Fifth Avenue Corportation D B A The Pierre, Ihms,Llc, represented by Novak, Gene, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Allan B Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllan B Weiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management108 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 10, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 25, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 30, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 10, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 30, 2021STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 19, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 30, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Hudson Spine & Pain Medicine
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 10, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 25, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 25, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on RJR Medical
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Lenox Hill Hospital
Date: September 27, 2022COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Yu-Fan Zhang, M.D.
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2021COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Neighborhood Radiology Services
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Sady Roberio Pain Managements and Services, P.C.
Date: September 27, 2022COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Orthopedic Institute at Lenox Hill
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 15, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: October 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 11, 2021COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Maxim Tyorkin
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Aleksey Lazarev, M.D.
Date: September 27, 2022COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Urban Heights Medical PC
Date: September 27, 2022COPY OF SUBPOENA Copy of Subpoena on Lenox Hill Radiology
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 23, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 30, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006) DECLINED TO SIGN |
||
January 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Order |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Order |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure Notice |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #006) Expert Witness Disclosure Notice |
||
January 19, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #006) Legal back and 130 Certification |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) Audiograma |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.