Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Luis Corvacho, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Goldstein, Ryan S, Guerrero, Enrique Onesimo, against Marjorie Alacqua, Mary Tom, represented by Robertson, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with DENIS J. BUTLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDENIS J. BUTLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management168 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 02, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 16, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: May 26, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 10, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 02, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Judgment Notice of Entry |
||
August 04, 2020 |
JUDGMENT Complaint Dismissed |
||
July 20, 2020 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment with Notice of Settlement (NOS 8/3/20) |
||
July 20, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order Notice of Entry |
||
July 16, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 16, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER SUA SPONTE |
||
June 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Disposed/Result of a Motion PART 12 VIRTUAL CONFERENCE, CONTROL DATE (Conversion) Judge: Butler, Hon. Denis J. |
|
June 12, 2020 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION PT 12 CONFERENCES VIRTUAL CONFERENCE CONTROL DATE Judge: DENIS J. BUTLER |
|
June 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
June 09, 2020 | Hearing |
ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.