Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Janet Lee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hahm, Benjamin Seunghwan, against E. J. Molinaespinoza, John Doe The Entire Name Being Fictitious, It Being Intended To Designate The Operator Of The Vehicle Mentioned Herein After, And, represented by Mccall, Brian Jude, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 17, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 21, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 24, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 17, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 11, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 18, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) letter withdrawing SJM |
||
October 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) transcript |
||
October 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) BP |
||
October 11, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
October 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) answer |
||
October 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) IME |
||
October 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) ISO |
||
October 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 11, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) threshold |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.