Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Inidira Griffith, Melda Griffith, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robertson, Kurt Dominic, against Stephanie M Vasiliou, represented by Girin, Eugene, Hong, Daniel Jungsup, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Laurentina Mcketney Butler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurentina Mcketney Butler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 08, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: February 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: July 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 17, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 21, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B |
||
January 08, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Notice of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Attorney |
||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #003) Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
August 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint |
||
August 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Affidavit of Plaintiff |
||
August 08, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Order to Show Cause |
||
August 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Answer |
||
August 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affirmations in Support of OSC |
||
July 05, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.