Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Giulia Kasollari, filed a(n) Torts - Product Liability (Defective Scooter) case represented by Gray, John E, against Amazon.Com Services, Inc. A K A Amazon.Com A Ka A Amazon, Xiaomi Usa, Inc., represented by Lodato, Vincent Robert, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Product Liability (Defective Scooter) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, by Giulia Kasollari against Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Xiaomi USA, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants regarding the design,...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2024ANSWER
Date: February 22, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2024COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 23, 2024SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: January 23, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS XIAOMI |
||
February 22, 2024 | Answer to Complaint | ||
January 26, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 1.22.24 |
||
January 23, 2024 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
January 23, 2024 | SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) | ||
January 22, 2024 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.