Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
George Mack Jr, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Hines, Philip M, Solomon, Thomas J, against Angelo Rivera, Pamela Edell, represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1123 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 04, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 22, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 22, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #3)
Date: August 15, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2011ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 13, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #003)
Date: September 03, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: August 15, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 30, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 12, 2013ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER SIGNED |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) affidavit of service order to show cause |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #003) | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #3) affirmation in support |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Exhibit D |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Exhibit C |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Exhibit B |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #3) good faith affirmation |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) order to show cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.