Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Richard Latin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management21 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time353 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: Compliance Conf Judge, |
|
March 15, 2019 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: COMPLIANCE CONF JUDGE |
|
October 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Compliance Conference Part Supreme Trial; NO APP (Conversion) Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
October 15, 2018 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE NO APP Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
August 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) PART 40 MOTIONS RESOLVED PER STIP (Conversion) Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
August 30, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) PT 40 MOTIONS RESOLVED PER STIP Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
August 13, 2018 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 08/30/2018Withdrawn Before Justice: Latin, Hon. Richard Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
August 13, 2018 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #001) Decided: 08/30/2018MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: RICHARD LATIN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
|
April 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Part Supreme Trial; FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Latin, Hon. Richard |
|
April 17, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PT 40 PRELIM CONF FINAL Judge: RICHARD LATIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.