Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FELICIANO, OLIVIA A. vs. FELICIANO, JOSE L.
A Mat-Contested case was filed in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY. Judge William A. Viscovich presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
November 08, 2021
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
Mat-Contested
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 23 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2016 | hearing |
Held PART 63 Supreme Trial; ABANDONED 2/1/17, JS 11/29/18 (Conversion) Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
October 20, 2016 | hearing |
INQUEST HELD/NON-JURY PT 63 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF ABANDONED 2/1/17 JS 11/29/18 Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |
|
September 21, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned PART 63 9:30A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
September 21, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 63 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF 9:30A.M. Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |
|
June 08, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned PART 63 Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
June 08, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 63 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |
|
March 02, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned PART 63 9:30A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
March 02, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 63 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF 9:30A.M. Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |
|
January 06, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned PART 63 9:30A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
January 06, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 63 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF 9:30A.M. Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |
|
September 30, 2015 | hearing |
Held PART 63 Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
September 30, 2015 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PT 63 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |
|
July 29, 2015 | hearing |
Preliminary Conference MAT PRELIM CONF Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Viscovich, Hon. William A. |
|
July 29, 2015 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD MATRIMONIAL PC PART Judge: WILLIAM A. VISCOVICH |