Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Putnam County, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Otsc Declaratory Judgment) case represented by Abissi, Heather Marie, Mckiernan, Conor Ryan, against Byron Voutsinas, represented by Maccarone, John L., in the jurisdiction of Putnam County. This case was filed in Putnam County Superior Courts with Gina C Capone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Otsc Declaratory Judgment) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
|
This complaint is a petition seeking a declaratory judgment, temporary restraining order, and preliminary injunction. Putnam County, represented by attorney Heather M. Abissi, is in a dispute with real estate broker Byron Voutsinas over the sale of a...
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: December 14, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 13, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Proof of Return of Deposit and Clearing of Check Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 13, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 13, 2023PETITION
Date: December 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Reply Exhibit 1 - Email from Baumgarner |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Reply Exhibit 3 - Email from Shilling |
||
January 25, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation in Reply |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Reply Exhibit 2 - Email Response to Shilling |
||
January 24, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Court |
||
January 23, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
||
January 23, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 23, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Notice of Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.