Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Christine Stanek, represented by Borgese, Frank Junior, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 06, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
December 28, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
November 16, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
November 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
September 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 14, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.