Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Universal Family Medical Pc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hooten, Paul J, against Olivia Seymour, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Gina C Capone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGina C Capone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 11, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 07, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 26, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 06, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 07, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 06, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 06, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 26, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 23, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.