Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wright To Paradise Ltd, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Davis, Stephen, against Town Of Carmel Assessor, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Victor G Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor G Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI)
Date: July 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: March 25, 2022ORDER - FINAL
Date: April 04, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | ORDER - FINAL | ||
March 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Resolution at 3/10 Trial; Stipulation on Record |
||
March 25, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Final Order |
||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Add'l, add'l proof of service |
||
August 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Add'l Aff of Service; Petition, etc. |
||
July 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Petit, Notice of Pet'n, Aff of serv & mailing, & Notice of e-file |
||
July 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.