Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
St, T. S., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Leder, Linc, Romanello, Diana Marie, Slater, Joseph M, against Brewster Central School District, represented by Banks, Steven Leon, Pakrul, Marc Christopher, Sibovits, Danit Leenor, Weisslitz, Emily R, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Leonard D Steinman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D Steinman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: May 26, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 03, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 16, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 13, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 10, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 29, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 07, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 03, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 16, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 14, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED)
Date: November 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 09, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 19, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: December 15, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 25, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 19, 2022 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
December 15, 2022 | ORDER - DISMISSAL | ||
November 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Amended Decision, original Decision on Plaintiff |
||
November 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Amended Order with Notice of Entry - Decision dated & entered on 11/15/22 |
||
November 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Original Order with Notice of Entry - Decision dated 11/7/22 entered on 11/9/22 |
||
November 15, 2022 | ORDER - AMENDED | ||
November 09, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 03, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #2) Amended Conformed Order to Show Cause |
||
November 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of conformed Order to Show Cause, Amended Order to Show Cause with supporting d Affidavit of Service of conformed Order to Show Cause, Amended Order to Show Cause with supporting d ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.