Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Louis Napolitano, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by De Giorgio, Michelle M, Demarco, Mario L., against Patricia Napolitano, represented by Silverman, Jane, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Victor G Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor G Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | ORDER - APPROVING ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) COMPENSATION UCS882 | ||
May 05, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 05, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
April 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 14, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
February 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 19, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
December 16, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
December 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.