Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John C. Buonora, Linda M. Buonora, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jacobs, Stacy L, Weingard, Laurence Jeffrey, against Dana R. Laquidara, Stephen Laquidara, represented by Ondrovic, Robert S, Ondrovic, Robert S., in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts Putnam County Supreme Court with Victor G Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor G Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HousePutnam County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1014 days |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 16, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 22, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 28, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 19, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 29, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 23, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 25, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 13, 2018REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: January 13, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 16, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 16, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: November 23, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 11, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 13, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 10, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 16, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 16, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 23, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 26, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 03, 2019ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 23, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 27, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued Victor G. Grossman Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
August 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Victor G. Grossman 9:30 JURY SELECTION, TRIAL 9/3 (Conversion) Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of discontinuance |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Victor G. Grossman Supreme Trial, 9:30 PTC (Conversion) Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.