Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, against A K A Curtis H Heintz And Old Albany Construction Llc, Aka Curtis H Heintz And Old Albany Construction Llc, Curtis Heintz A K A Curtis H Heintz And Old Albany Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County. This case was filed in Putnam County Superior Courts with Gina C Capone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 07, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: June 04, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: May 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: June 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 31, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Notice of Entry of Judgment entered 7/26/23 | ||
August 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 26, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Balance Statement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 | Affirmation in Support | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Last Payment Statement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Agreement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavits of Service of S&C - Additional Mailings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.