Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Heide & Williams, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Murphy, John Michael, against Pacific Hospitaity Group, Llc, Napa Hospitality Partners, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Heide & Williams, Inc. vs. Napa Hospitality Partners, LLC ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 7 2007 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.