Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
J&S Auto Credit Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Morris, Scott Andrew, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Sara Burgher, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed by J&S Auto Credit, Inc. against Sara Burgher. The complaint alleges that Sara Burgher entered into a non-revolving credit contract with J&S Auto Credit, Inc. for the purchase of an automobile on March 12, 202...
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 02, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Discontinuance |
||
October 02, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC- RETURNED DOC |
||
August 30, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
August 23, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 01, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 01, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.