Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lowe'S Home Centers, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Ferruggia, Frank E, against Assessor Town Of Oneonta, Board Of Assessment Review Town Of Oneonta, County Of Otsego, State Of New York, Town Of Oneonta, (total of 5) See All represented by Clarke, Edward Hyde, Panasci, Robert A, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 14, 2023PETITION
Date: July 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
July 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Determination |
||
July 13, 2023 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.