Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Taylor J Pushkar, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 08, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 08, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 16, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit |
||
September 08, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney affirmation of facts |
||
September 08, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION statue of limitations affirmation |
||
September 08, 2023 | affidavit of compliance | ||
August 15, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
August 11, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
July 11, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization Otsego |
||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Taylor J. Pushkar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.