Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Keybank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Jacobs, Jonathan Wayne, Polowy, Amy E., Puscheck, Kathleen Elizabeth, against Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under, General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In, John Doe, Jude Lynch As Heir To The Estate Of Barbara A. Campbell, Michael Lynch As Heir To The Estate Of Barbara A. Campbell, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under
General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In
Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors,
Trustees, Committees, Lienors, And Assigns, All Of Whom And Whose Names, Except As Stated, Are Unknown To Plaintiff
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 JUDE LYNCH AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. CAMPBELL |
||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JUDE LYNCH AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. CAMPBELL |
||
August 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AOM MICHAEL LYNCH AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. CAMPBELL |
||
August 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MICHAEL LYNCH AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. CAMPBELL |
||
June 30, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
June 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AOS |
||
June 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AOM |
||
June 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE IRS AOS |
||
June 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE IRS AOM |
||
June 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.