Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Kelly M Miller, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 06, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: January 21, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 06, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER - AWARDING FEE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
January 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 21, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 12, 2022 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) Order Granting Default Judgment and attorneys' fees signed by Judge Burns on 1/11/2022. |
||
January 07, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Judgement Exhibit A-E |
||
January 06, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
January 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
January 06, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 06, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.