Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Community Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Brianna L Whitehill, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 15, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Contract
Date: October 28, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 29, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTY AFF & COST |
||
October 28, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Contract Contract Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Search |
||
October 28, 2021 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
October 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
October 28, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
January 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.