Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Unifund Ccr, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Phillips, Elliot, Scully, James Paul, against Susan M Bronson, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions257 days |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 07, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: September 21, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 21, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 05, 2020STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: September 21, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 21, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 21, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 LTR TO DEFENDANT(S) |
||
September 21, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
September 21, 2020 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
September 21, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 21, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Service Invoice |
||
September 21, 2020 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
February 05, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
February 03, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.