Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mr Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against David Bennett Estate Of , As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of David Bennett, David Bennett Estate Of , As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of David Bennett, John A Bennett, John Doe 1-12 1 - John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, John Doe 1-12 1 - John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, (total of 12) See All represented by Larkin, William F, Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
John Doe 1-12 1 - John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 02, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 18, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 07, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 18, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 16, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 22, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 25, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 11, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 21, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: September 15, 2021COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 10, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: October 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2) F- 90 Day Notice
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2) G- Non-mil Affidavit
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2) L- Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due
Date: February 14, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: October 24, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 06, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: November 23, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 08, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT (Motion #2) Return to Sender Foreclosure Auction Letter to John A. Bennett (Forward Time Expired) |
||
December 08, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT (Motion #2) Undeliverable Foreclosure Auction Letter to Rebecca Bennett |
||
November 23, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
October 24, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 11, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2) Foreclosure Auction: 10/18/2022 at 10:00 a.m. |
||
October 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Default Judgment, Order of Reference, and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
August 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
April 27, 2022 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2) Default Judgment and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale signed by Judge Burns on 4/25/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.