Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
M & T Bank, Partners Trust Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Johnson, Heather Ann, Mariani, William Joseph, Ruuska, Ryan E, against Housing And Urban Development Secretary Of, John Doe 1-50, Mary Roe 1-50, Partners Trust Bank, Tammy Leech, (total of 8) See All represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time205 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 27, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 22, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit for Affirmation |
||
February 21, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 21, 2019 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
February 21, 2019 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 26, 2018 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 13, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE - JOHN AND JANE DOES |
||
September 11, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - TAMMY LEACH |
||
September 11, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - TAMMY LEACH |
||
August 31, 2018 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 27, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.